Financial history WELDABILITY SIF FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1142419
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £180.60k £6.18k £83.02k £14.40k £243.97k
Total expenditure £231.59k £113.61k £131.09k £28.61k £248.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A