EVERYONE MATTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Everyone Matters delivers high quality professional music-making: workshops for children and young people, particularly those with special needs; interactive concerts for older people in care settings, and a special scheme for those with dementia; mentoring young, and adult amateur, musicians to perform alongside professionals for older people in care settings; lecture-recitals for music lovers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Morisy | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Lawrence Bullen | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA MARY OPENSHAW | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janice Ann Gillard | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Margaret Britton | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET EGGLEDEN LRAM ARAM | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.62k | £18.22k | £21.24k | £17.55k | £13.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.29k | £19.52k | £15.30k | £27.31k | £17.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.26k | £5.27k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/08/2011
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED OR INFIRM THROUGH THE USE OF PERFORMING ARTS (IN PARTICULAR MUSIC) AND RELATED THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITY 2.THE PROMOTION OF PERFORMING ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PARTICIPATION IN ARTS FESTIVALS, COLLABORATION WITH LOCAL SOCIETIES AND THROUGH WORK WITHIN SCHOOLS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Stone Road
BROMLEY
BR2 9AX
- Phone:
- 02084641645
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window