ISLEWORTH DEEN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Vision Our vision is to provide a range of holistic, culturally sensitive services for the communities, drawing on our Islamic values and heritage, with a view to improving quality of life and enhancing community cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hounslow
Governance
- 02 August 2011: Standard registration
- WLMC (Working name)
- WEST LONDON MUSLIM CENTRE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MD MOSHIUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
AKBAR MUHAMMAD HUSSAIN | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Mizanur Rahman | Trustee | 14 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Masudur Rahman | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Shirajul Islam | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Abdul Rup Ali | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Muhammed Abu Sayed Ansarey | Trustee | 30 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Imran Mohammed Monaf | Trustee | 30 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.97k | £50.94k | £222.95k | £226.06k | £362.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.17k | £27.32k | £75.97k | £79.61k | £112.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 April 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 April 2024 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Isleworth Deen Centre & Community
The George
114 Twickenham Road
Isleworth
TW7 7DJ
- Phone:
- 02085701999
- Email:
- info@isleworthdeencentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window