Financial history HOWDEN AGRICULTURE AND HORTICULTURE SHOW LIMITED

Charity number: 1146788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £39.44k £30 £5.36k £40.45k £41.66k
Total expenditure £37.34k £5.33k £3.71k £35.04k £36.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £998 N/A N/A £998 £1.47k