QUEST FOR EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds to provide quality education in rural areas of Pakistan, with a particular focus on delivering opportunity to girls and young women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 June 2011: Standard registration
- QFE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHABAT HUSSAIN | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Martin Cawley | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Jamil Khan | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Salmaan Hussain | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Usman Javed | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hasham Amin Khan | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alison Scott Baumann | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sundila Andleeb | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Anthony O'Sullivan | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marie-Claire Hawthorne | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Durdana Jabeen Ansari OBE | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MOBEEN ANWAR | Trustee | 13 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
IFFAT FERDINAND | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.60k | £14.64k | £9.80k | £11.55k | £4.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.60k | £2.72k | £1.87k | £2.52k | £7.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN RURAL COMMUNITIES IN ASIA AND AFRICA BY: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING QUALITY OF STANDARDS IN EDUCATION; 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
ASIA AND AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 GLENCOE AVENUE
ILFORD
IG2 7AJ
- Phone:
- 02038587550
- Email:
- contact@qef.global
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window