Foodshare

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We feed people in and around Maidenhead who are in such poverty that they are unable to feed themselves properly, along with other support where appropriate. We also provide volunteering opportunities for people in and around Maidenhead to provide help for people in poverty who may live outside the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £42,178 from 5 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Slough
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 13 July 2011: Standard registration
- Foodshare Maidenhead (Working name)
- OPEN KITCHEN (Working name)
- OPEN KITCHEN, FOODSHARE (Working name)
- REFUGEE RELIEF, SLOUGH AND MAIDENHEAD (Working name)
- REFUGEE SUPPORT, SLOUGH AND MAIDENHEAD (Working name)
- OPEN CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debra Gee | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Mark Lester Tanner | Trustee | 06 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
NIGEL COHEN | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.93k | £351.83k | £240.79k | £260.92k | £289.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.83k | £61.07k | £59.38k | £48.76k | £81.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.50k | N/A | £56.24k | £38.67k | £42.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12/07/2011 as amended on 26 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS, ELDERLY, LIVING IN POVERTY, WHO HAVE A DRUG OR ALCOHOL DEPENDENCY OR WHO ARE IN SOME OTHER WAY SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED IN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE BY PROVIDING SUCH CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES DEEMS FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chalkpit Nursery
Chalk Pit Lane
Burnham
Slough
SL1 8NH
- Phone:
- 01628 262 711
- Email:
- info@foodshare.charity
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window