APOSTOLIC FAITH MISSION INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES (UK) LEEDS ASSEMBLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE BIBLE AS CONTAINED IN OUR CONFESSION OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- City Of Wakefield
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 18 July 2011: Standard registration
- AFM IM UK LEEDS (Working name)
- APOSTOLIC FAITH MISSION IM UK LEEDS ASSEMBLY (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tarisai Manyewe | Chair | 18 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Felix Guveya | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kudzanayi Pearson Mandudzo | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.00k | £81.19k | £63.11k | £76.94k | £9.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.16k | £72.12k | £73.54k | £38.23k | £16.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 February 2025 | 743 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE BIBLE AS CONTAINED IN OUR CONFESSION OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Goodwood Road
PONTEFRACT
WF8 2GA
- Phone:
- 07964685738
- Email:
- afmassembly.leeds@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window