SWALEDALE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Provision of an emergency rescue service for an area of 500 square miles centered on Swaledale and Wensleydale, 24 hrs per day, every day of the year. As well as rescuing people and animals in peril in the hills and caves of the area, the Swaledale Mountain Rescue Team encourages sensible use of the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 03 October 1972: Standard registration
- 21 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1201870 SWALEDALE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM
- SWALEDALE FELL RESCUE ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.77k | £86.71k | £111.08k | £168.35k | £9.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.07k | £50.70k | £68.10k | £96.23k | £9.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £16.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAY 1968 AS AMENDED 13 APRIL 1973, 28 APRIL 2004 AND 27 APRIL 2005 as amended on 26 Apr 2016 as amended on 27 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VOLUNTARY EMERGENCY SEARCH AND RESCUE SERVICE, ASSISTING PERSONS AND ANIMALS LOST OR IN DISTRESS
Area of benefit
THE AREA COVERED BY RICHMONDSHIRE DISTRICT COUNCIL TO THE WEST OF THE A1 ROAD AND LAND LYING BETWEEN ITS NORTHERN BOUNDARY AND THE A66 ROAD WESTWARD TO THE CUMBRIA BORDER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window