MARY LIDSTONE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of financial assistance for students and former students of King Edward VI Community College, Totnes, Devon (KEVICC) to help them to undertake higher or further education at other academic institutions after finishing their studies at KEVICC and who are considered by the Trustees to be financially disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Devon
Governance
- 22 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin James Evans | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Michael Salt | Trustee | 10 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ELIZABETH STEPHENS | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHARLIE STEPHENS | Trustee | 22 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.87k | £60.65k | £71.37k | £60.49k | £54.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.90k | £78.89k | £73.04k | £34.37k | £73.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 October 2021 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 October 2021 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 29/10/2010
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR STUDENTS AND FORMER STUDENTS OF KIND EDWARD VI COMMUNITY COLLEGE TOTNES (KEVICC) TO HELP THEM UNDERTAKE HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION AT OTHER ACADEMIC INSTITIUTIONS AFTER FINISHING THEIR STUDEIS AT KEVICC AND WHO ARE CONSIDERED BY THE CHARITY TRUSTEES TO BE FINANCIALLY DISADVANTAGED
Contact information
- Address:
-
King Edward VI Community College
Ashburton Road
Totnes
TQ9 5JX
- Phone:
- 01803869200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window