Financial history GREAT BRITAIN WHEELCHAIR BASKETBALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1144808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.10m £1.51m £1.98m £1.80m £2.46m
Total expenditure £2.03m £1.43m £1.71m £1.92m £2.18m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.67m £1.43m £1.89m £1.63m £2.15m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.91m £1.43m £1.81m £1.64m £2.18m
Income - Other trading activities £27.73k £7.29k £39.88k £41.10k £161.51k
Income - Charitable activities £162.12k £78.13k £133.73k £123.61k £121.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.38k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.01m £1.43m £1.69m £1.91m £2.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.59k £402 £16.59k £9.90k £4.05k
Expenditure - Governance £218.60k £199.85k £204.73k £17.77k £22.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £24.40k £6.80k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £4.48k £0 £0 £0 £0