CROWN GOSPEL MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR WORSHIP SERVICES IN THE COMMUNITY TO ENCOURAGE BELIEF IN THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 June 2011: Standard registration
- 09 September 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 November 2016: Re-registered
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 September 2017: Re-registered
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- DESTINY CENTRE (Working name)
- CGM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £950 | £5.10k | £7.48k | £6.08k | £7.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £900 | £5.55k | £5.56k | £5.11k | £6.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 02 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 02 November 2019 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 23 February 2018 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 26 September 2017 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 08/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION'S ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH[IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window