EVERSLEY SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Eversley Sports Association is a charity based in Eversley, Hampshire that provides and runs sports facilities in Eversley for use by local clubs and the community. The overriding objectives of the ESA are to widen and deepen the access for junior and senior players to cricket, football and hockey, and to provide a high standard of organised competitive sports and skills training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Reading
- Surrey
- Wokingham
Governance
- 20 July 2011: Standard registration
- ESA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Henry Craston | Chair | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katie-Jayne Turner | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ELLIS | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dereck Paterson | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Morgan | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Andrew Last | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Perkin | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Bolt | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Richard Elcox | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edward James Lynskey | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Buckland | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVAN ALAN MICHAEL NEVILLE | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
GARY DAVID CHARLES FORD | Trustee | 02 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.13k | £216.89k | £155.27k | £215.53k | £274.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.95k | £240.90k | £240.02k | £245.92k | £283.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE: 3.1 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF: 3.1.1COLTS AND SENIOR CRICKET; 3.1.2JUNIOR AND SENIOR FOOTBALL; 3.1.3JUNIOR AND SENIOR HOCKEY; 3.1.4OTHER SPORTS WHICH ARE CAPABLE OF IMPROVING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS; AND 3.2 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ESA CLUBHOUSE
CROSS GREEN
EVERSLEY
HOOK
HAMPSHIRE
RG27 0NS
- Phone:
- 01189735853
- Email:
- mperkin@andiam.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window