Financial history WORDWIDE ACTION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1143045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £420 £200 £350 £120 £120
Total expenditure £330 £150 £215 £80 £80
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A