FRIENDS OF WAYCROFT ACADEMY

Charity Number: 1143200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the Friends is to advance and enhance the education of pupils of the school by: supplementing the resources and facilities used by the children (not normally provided by the Local Education Authority), fostering relationships between staff, parents and the local community, and engaging in activities which support the school and advance the education of the pupils attending it.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £21,111
Total expenditure: £16,105

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 August 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF WAYCROFT (Previous name)
  • FRIENDS OF WAYCROFT PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Taylor Chair 01 October 2021
None on record
Lisa Roberts Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.86k £2.40k £4.88k £11.81k £21.11k
Total expenditure £10.14k £5.01k £5.07k £6.76k £16.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 March 2021 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Waycroft Academy
Selden Road
BRISTOL
BS14 8PS
Phone:
07917714604