THE LEICESTER BACH CHOIR

Charity number: 501890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Performing several concerts per year, plus choral workshops for a wider audience. We offer free membership to all full time students and a reduced subscription for singers under the age of 26.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £35,858
Total expenditure: £36,183

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 September 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Scott Chair 25 September 2024
None on record
David Philip Lawton Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Dr Rebecca Susan Hames Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Dr Jennifer Wilkinson Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Michael John William Randle Trustee 22 September 2021
None on record
Paul Leonard - Williams Trustee 02 September 2020
None on record
Patricia Taylor Trustee 02 September 2020
None on record
Elizabeth Jennifer Casboult Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
Jacqueline Burden Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
Gail Elizabeth Hobbs Trustee 07 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £30.62k £1.82k £21.39k £34.80k £35.86k
Total expenditure £25.58k £10.52k £23.58k £28.02k £36.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 24 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 24 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 22 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 22 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
37 HOLMFIELD ROAD
LEICESTER
LE2 1SE
Phone:
07931525174