Governing document THE LEICESTER BACH CHOIR
Charity number: 501890

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH SEPTEMBER 1972 AS AMENDED 7 SEPTEMBER 1983, 28 AUGUST 1990, 2 SEPTEMBER 1998 AND 02 SEPTEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED ON 06 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED ON 04 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT CHORAL MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND RELATED ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LEICESTERSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.