PCEA UK OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Gikubu MUKABI | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kariuki Irad | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Mwangi Ngure | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Waithaka | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Reuben Anthony Sampson John | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev EDWIN MBUGUA KIBATHI | Trustee | 02 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.64k | £62.42k | £87.08k | £103.50k | £120.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.08k | £51.19k | £59.92k | £123.75k | £109.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 02 January 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 02 January 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 17 January 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN ESSEX AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
395 Barking Road
London
E13 8AL
- Phone:
- 07946700301
- Website:
-
pceaukoutreach.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window