THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MARY MAGDALENE WHISTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special needs groups. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rotherham
Governance
- 08 June 2011: Standard registration
- PCC FOR THE PARISH OF WHISTON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Karen Rachel Skidmore | Chair | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Sparrow | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Sparrow | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Kelly | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Ellson | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Rodney Ellson | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colette Antoinette Jeanne Therese White | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann Dunsford MBE | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Pamela Jackson | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Booker | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan David Teale | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW DAVID HOPPS MA | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARY ELIZABETH HOLT | Trustee | 19 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alan James Bradbury | Trustee | 08 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR RAY GALLAGHER | Trustee | 08 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK WHITE | Trustee | 24 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.43k | £122.21k | £107.57k | £107.86k | £106.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.72k | £107.80k | £97.90k | £113.20k | £117.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Church of England Measures
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
493 Herringthorpe Valley Road
ROTHERHAM
South Yorkshire
S60 4LB
- Phone:
- 01709836052
- Email:
- karen.skidmore@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window