BILL QUAY COMMUNITY FARM ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bill Quay Community Farm Association are no longer linked to Bill Quay Farm. We are a local community association, engaging the public with farming, the outdoors and volunteering, for environmental and wellbeing purpose. We work to advance education in agriculture, horticulture, arts and crafts, conservation and related subjects. We specialise in UK native and rare breed livestock
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gateshead
Governance
- 21 March 2012: Standard registration
- 24 April 2012: Funds received from 517779 BILL QUAY COMMUNITY FARM ASSOCIATION
- 17 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.40k | £50.34k | £5.54k | £13.79k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.84k | £54.32k | £6.34k | £3.41k | £10.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £65.00k | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 34 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, ARTS AND CRAFTS, CONSERVATION, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS; TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, OR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO ANIMAL WELFARE, INCLUDING THE CONSERVATION AND ENHANCEMENT OF GENETIC DIVERSITY OF UK NATIVE LIVESTOCK BREEDS, INCLUDING BREEDS AT RISK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window