THE BEAVERBROOKS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1142857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's main objectives are: To provide aid and support to a broad spectrum of charities which includes and covers education, welfare, health, mentoring and self-development, Jewish and Israeli charities and the community as a whole. To enable the employees of Beaverbrooks The Jewellers Ltd. to support their local charities both in terms of fund raising and the giving of their time.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 2011: Standard registration
  • 14 October 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 30 November 2013: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK ISAAC ADLESTONE OBE DL Chair 13 July 2011
THE GREATER MANCHESTER HIGH SHERIFF'S POLICE TRUST
Received: On time
Paul Holly Trustee 11 July 2018
None on record
ANNA BLACKBURN Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record
Susie Nicholas Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £1.89m £363.63k £443.50k £802.89k £2.15m
Total expenditure £1.85m £1.40m £1.48m £2.36m £2.24m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.76m N/A N/A £656.97k £2.01m
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £129.28k N/A N/A £145.92k £141.57k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.85m N/A N/A £2.36m £2.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £182 N/A N/A £154 £181
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.85m N/A N/A £2.36m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Own use assets £0 N/A N/A £350.00k £350.00k
Long-term investments £8.33m N/A N/A £4.32m £4.32m
Other assets £54.86k N/A N/A £77.83k £0
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £0 N/A N/A £0 £12.77k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 12 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 11 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 23 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 20 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 22 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ADELE HOUSE
PARK ROAD
ST. ANNES-ON-SEA
LANCASHIRE
FY8 1RE
Phone:
01253721262
Website:

No information available