CRAWLEY COMMUNITY YOUTH SERVICE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Crawley Community Youth Service benefits young people through Youth Clubs, one-off projects, Community events or simply providing safe places. We bring together local organisations working with young people to share ideas, resources, skills and support. We link to County/National bodies representing the young people from Crawley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 July 2011: Standard registration
- ICYS (Working name)
- IFIELD COMMUNITY YOUTH SERVICE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Baker | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Thomas | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Gardiner | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
PIPPA FORDE | Trustee | 25 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.52k | £220.11k | £315.44k | £324.42k | £257.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.11k | £162.11k | £292.84k | £354.00k | £284.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.75k | £69.02k | £94.68k | £15.00k | £31.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING WITHIN CRAWLEY, WEST SUSSEX BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 4.2 TO CONSULT YOUNG MEMBERS BELONGING TO PROGRAMMES PROVIDED BY THE CHARITY AS WELL AS YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE COMMUNITY OF CRAWLEY NORTH-WEST IN ALL MATTERS PERTAINING TO POLICY AND PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES THROUGH OPEN MEETINGS AT PUBLIC VENUES OR THROUGH SURVEYS OF OPINION; 4.3 TO INVOLVE YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 IN THE DAY-TO-DAY OPERATIONS OF THE CHARITY AS VOLUNTEERS ENSURING THE APPROPRIATE TRAINING, INDUCTION AND SUPPORT IS PROVIDED TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE INDEPENDENTLY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dormans Youth Arts Centre
Dormans
CRAWLEY
West Sussex
RH11 8HZ
- Phone:
- 01293526388
- Email:
- admin@ccys.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window