THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST MERSEA ST PETER AND ST PAUL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities according to the doctrine and practices of The Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 01 July 2011: Standard registration
- WEST MERSEA ST PETER AND ST PAUL PCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Peter | Chair | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jo Parrott | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
STEVEN GAUNT | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Sanderson | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robert Joslin Stan | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Julie Cornwell | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOHN RICHARD PANTRY | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER LESLEY FRANCES KING | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
CATHY ROBERTS | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
LIZZIE DUMAS | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|||||
ROLAND JOHN GARDENER | Trustee | 01 July 2011 |
|
|||||
PETE EASY | Trustee | 15 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.47k | £192.46k | £146.48k | £146.36k | £149.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.13k | £132.22k | £160.08k | £149.82k | £161.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Excepted
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PETER & ST. PAUL
HIGH STREET
WEST MERSEA
COLCHESTER
CO5 8QD
- Phone:
- 01206383222
- Email:
- admin@freshsalt.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window