THE RICHARD STREET EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charities objective is to benefit principally the residents of the London Borough of Tower Hamlets, by associating together the said residents and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation leisure time, thereby improving the conditions of life for the residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 07 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Elizabeth Bromley | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Farrell | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Uzma Rahim | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.11k | £6.01k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £253.99k | £20.32k | £5.45k | £1.15k | £2.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £47.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 17 September 2024 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 January 2022 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 344 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 APR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT PRINCIPALLY THE RESIDENTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mulberry & Bigland Green Centre
15 Richard Street
LONDON
E1 2JP
- Phone:
- 020 7790 6327
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window