TOP VALLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Top Valley Community Centre aim to provide a range of activities and services for the local and wider communities. Some of our regular activities include sports, Faith groups, Zumba, fitness sessions (Y.M.C.A), Slimming World, Tenants and Residents Association. Craft and Chat , Coffee mornings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £3,037 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 21 June 2011: Standard registration
- TOP VALLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Paul Grocock | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ROBIN GOODWIN | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER NEEDHAM | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
TERESA GOODWIN | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.54k | £45.69k | £35.42k | £39.89k | £44.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.87k | £25.18k | £30.71k | £30.99k | £37.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.43k | £16.59k | £8.09k | £2.72k | £3.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/05/2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO: 3.1 PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2 ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; 3.3 PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 6
TOP VALLEY WAY
TOP VALLEY
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 9DD
- Phone:
- 01159756016
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window