Financial history THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF GLOVERS OF LONDON CHARITABLE ENDOWMENT

Charity number: 1142506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £55.92k £28.46k £28.92k £28.97k £39.94k
Total expenditure £864 £902 £2.42k £1.15k £1.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A