RED ZEBRA COMMUNITY SOLUTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, support and undertake voluntary work within the sphere of social and community service, education, health and similar charitable activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £161,276 from 1 government contract(s) and £121,080 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- EKVAS (Working name)
- EAST KENT VOLUNTARY ACTION SUPPORT LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ron Elliott | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Harris | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Flanagan | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Dearth | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £795.56k | £471.72k | £356.03k | £344.30k | £295.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £964.11k | £619.31k | £370.86k | £333.63k | £295.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £161.28k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £33.40k | £311.34k | £329.09k | £121.08k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £780.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £13.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £905.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £47.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £226.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £58.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 March 2025 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 March 2025 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 282 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 163 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/08/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK WITHIN THE SPHERE OF SOCIAL AND COMMUNITY SERVICE, EDUCATION, HEALTH AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit B2
Clover House
1 Thanet Way
Whitstable
Kent
CT5 1BW
- Phone:
- 01227 262313
- Email:
- info@redzebra.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window