Financial history CYMDEITHAS GOFAL THE CARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1143732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.23m £1.36m £1.50m £1.65m £1.62m
Total expenditure £1.10m £1.11m £1.37m £1.43m £1.62m
Income from government contracts N/A £286.80k £329.51k £345.27k £394.15k
Income from government grants £636.57k £629.05k £388.93k £304.48k £570.87k
Income - Donations and legacies £12.96k £13.31k £8.34k £9.69k £7.50k
Income - Other trading activities £75.92k £42.97k £93.31k £105.51k £90.35k
Income - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.21m £1.36m £1.52m £1.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £230 £54 £30 £531 £4.17k
Income - Other £8.59k £88.37k £36.66k £15.96k £6.06k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.05m £1.31m £1.35m £1.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £57.40k £62.37k £61.66k £74.28k £101.84k
Expenditure - Governance £5.93k £0 £4.67k £3.30k £5.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £850 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0