Trustees THE LAST NIGHT A DJ SAVED MY LIFE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1142478

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Silvia Montello | Chair | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Jukes | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Aquila Sunderland | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ross David Murray | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Amos Cowan | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lee Martin Morrison | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Pelling | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Heale | Trustee | 27 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Runcie | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN REYNOLDS | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.