PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ABBEYDALE AND MILLHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular Christian public worship available to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and meditation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Provision of Public Baptism, Marriage and Funerals. Supporting activities for children, young people and adults in the community. Promotion of the mission of the Church and support of other charities in UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 20 June 2011: Standard registration
- HOLY TRINITY, MILLHOUSES (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ABBYDALE AND MILLHOUSES (Previous name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, MILLHOUSES (DIOCESE OF SHEFFIELD) (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicholas Noble | Chair | 17 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Catherine Staziker | Trustee | 12 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Juanita Haigh | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean White | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Hutchesson | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Savournin | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie-Jane Harwood | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Horsfield | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gail Crosby | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hill | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Smith | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Frost | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Harwood | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Tulley | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN WRIGLEY | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Michael Morton-Thorpe | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Caitlin Boddye | Trustee | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Crosby | Trustee | 30 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAT GREGORY | Trustee | 30 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £262.66k | £183.03k | £203.81k | £276.95k | £221.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.47k | £220.99k | £213.97k | £445.23k | £221.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1956 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Rushley Drive
SHEFFIELD
S17 3EL
- Phone:
- 01144539615
- Email:
- davidcrosby85@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window