Accounts and annual returns THE PURBROOK PARK LEARNING TRUST

Charity number: 1142562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 March 2024 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 March 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 March 2021 39 days late Download Open in new window