THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTHAMPTON STUDENTS' UNION

Charity Number: 1144827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The University of Northampton Students' Union exists to support students at the University as they progress through their studies. We do this by: - - providing guidance and support for educational needs; - delivering welfare awareness campaigns; - providing personal and team development opportunities, through sports clubs and other societies; and - providing social space and activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 November 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • UNSU (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Muhammed Hafiz KALLIVALAPPIL SAIDU MUHAMMED Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Oscar Chapman Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Dr Arlina Mauree Dr Trustee 30 May 2024
NORTHAMPTON STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
Jason Sparkhall Mr Trustee 10 May 2024
NORTHAMPTON STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
Chizoba Okonkwo Trustee 18 April 2024
None on record
Fajar Ajmal Butt Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
ROSNA ROY Trustee 19 June 2023
NORTHAMPTON STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
Leanne Wilkins Trustee 01 December 2022
NORTHAMPTON STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
Hannah Templeman Trustee 27 May 2021
NORTHAMPTON STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered
Paul Wood Trustee 27 May 2021
NORTHAMPTON STUDENTS' UNION
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.09m £1.46m £1.61m £1.75m £1.90m
Total expenditure £2.50m £1.78m £2.11m £3.01m £1.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £256.41k £15.88k £0 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £1.32m £1.50m £1.64m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.04m £19.98k £214.28k £218.63k £259.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.62k £58 £109 £573 £0
Income - Other £50.67k £1.44m £77.65k £39.91k £1.94k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.49m £1.58m £2.11m £3.01m £1.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £202.18k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £14.51k £20.44k £27.09k £33.62k £36.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £18.57k £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets £2.48m £2.07m £1.74m £487.62k £460.41k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £443.62k £670.24k £422.55k £310.80k £518.08k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £199.36k £333.54k £260.03k £145.21k £102.69k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 09 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 09 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 20 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 04 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 04 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 28 July 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 28 July 2022 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 11 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Univ. of Northampton Students Union
The Engine Shed
University Drive
Northampton
NN1 5PH
Phone:
01604892818