MAASAI EVANGELISTIC ASSOCIATION UK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- The advancement of the Christian religion. - The relief of poverty and distress. - The advancement of education in the Republic of Kenya, the United Republic of Tanzania and worldwide:
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kenya
- Tanzania
Governance
- 08 February 2012: Standard registration
- MEA UK TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RICHARD ALEXANDER SCOTT | Chair | 05 August 2011 |
|
|||||
Dr ANTHONY GEORGE MALES | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|||||
David George Rhodes | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Douglas Boyer | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY PETER NORRIS | Trustee | 05 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.86k | £18.72k | £9.59k | £11.40k | £15.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.35k | £18.79k | £10.41k | £9.85k | £15.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TrustDeed
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS IN THE REPUBLIC OF KENYA THE UNITED REPUBLIC OF TANZANIA AND WORLDWIDE AND (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE REPUBLIC OF KENYA THE UNITED REPUBLIC OF TANZANIA AND WORLDWIDE (4) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WORLDWIDE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Dagmar Road
EXMOUTH
Devon
EX8 2AN
- Phone:
- 01395830421
- Email:
- contact@mea-uk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window