THE KIDNEY CENTRE KARACHI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Kidney Centre is a philanthropic Institution for the treatment of renal and renal-related diseases. The Centre has an up-to-date medical facility providing comprehensive quality care to thousands of patients, the majority of whom are very poor and cannot afford such treatments. The Kidney Centre is funded almost exclusively through donations and other forms of charitable fundraising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Pakistan
Governance
- 12 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamal Dhanani | Trustee | 15 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Akbar Rafiq | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MELIHA CHUGHTAI | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Ashar Qureshi | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARRIANA KARIM | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
FARHANA SAYEED | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.09k | £3.07k | £1.06k | £9.46k | £3.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.24k | £181.21k | £1.18k | £56.21k | £198 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 February 2025 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE WITH RENAL DISEASES LIVING IN PAKISTAN, IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL FACILITIES AT THE KIDNEY CENTRE POST GRADUATE TRAINING INSTITUTE, KARACHI.
Contact information
- Address:
-
59-61 Kensington High Street
London
W8 5ED
- Phone:
- 07881824362
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window