THE OYSTON ANGEL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to promote the care, rehabilitation and resettlement of the following people: (1) offenders & former offenders (2) persons under a disability (including without limitation, those suffering or who have suffered from any form of addiction or substance abuse) (3) persons under social or economic deprivation by way of any method which shall be recognised as charitable
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 August 2011: Standard registration
- THE OYSTON ANGEL TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary James Charnock | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £16.09k | £16.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 September 2024 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE, REHABILITATION AND RESETTLEMENT OF THE FOLLOWING PEOPLE: (I) OFFENDERS AND FORMER OFFENDERS, BY WAY OF ANY METHOD WHICH SHALL BE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY GRANT OR OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, RESETTLEMENT, THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE WITH ACCOMMODATION, EDUCATION, COUNSELLING AND THE PROVISION OF OTHER ADVICE, TRAINING, RETRAINING AND THE FINDING OR PROVISION OF WORK OPPORTUNITIES (II) PERSONS UNDER A DISABILITY (INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THOSE SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM ANY FORM OF ADDICTION OR SUBSTANCE ABUSE), BY WAY OF ANY METHOD WHICH SHALL BE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY GRANT OR OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, RESETTLEMENT, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE WITH ACCOMMODATION, EDUCATION, COUNSELLING AND THE PROVISION OF OTHER ADVICE, TRAINING, RETRAINING AND THE FINDING OR PROVISION OF WORK OPPORTUNITIES. (III) PERSONS UNDER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION, BY WAY OF ANY METHOD WHICH SHALL BE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY GRANT OR OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, RESETTLEMENT, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE WITH ACCOMMODATION, EDUCATION, COUNSELLING AND THE PROVISION OF OTHER ADVICE, TRAINING, RETRAINING AND THE FINDING OR PROVISION OF WORK OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oyston Angel Trust
Strand Road Works
Strand Road
PRESTON
PR1 8UR
- Phone:
- 01253336580
- Email:
- oystonangeltrust@denwis.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window