BRITISH MATERNAL AND FETAL MEDICINE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society aims to provide a forum where issues of relevance to Obstetricians and other professionals involved in maternity care are discussed. In particular the Society seeks to Disseminate knowledge, Promote research and audit, Establish good quality training programmes and Encourage development of clinical guidelines.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 December 2011: Standard registration
- BMFMS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Emma Louise Ferriman | Chair | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Surabhi Nanda | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melissa Kate Whitworth | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.70k | £64.13k | £105.12k | £177.97k | £206.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.88k | £24.77k | £46.34k | £177.51k | £121.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/03/1997 AS AMENDED ON 16/09/2011 as amended on 14 Dec 2020 as amended on 26 Apr 2024 as amended on 26 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF MATERNAL AND FETAL MEDICINE AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY ENCOURAGING IMPROVED STANDARDS OF PREGNANCY CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal College Of Obstetricians
10-18 Union Street
LONDON
SE1 1SZ
- Phone:
- 02077726211
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
bmfms.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window