DISCOVER ISLAM LUTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- PROVIDING A LIBRARY/PUBLIC INFORMATION CENTRE FOR THE PUBLIC TO LEARN ABOUT ISLAM - DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ABOUT ISLAM - DELIVERING LECTURES AND WORKSHOPS ABOUT ISLAM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC - SUPPORTING LOCAL CHARITIES IN LUTON BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS TO THOSE WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Luton
Governance
- 15 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Imran Suleman | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
AABID KHAN | Trustee | 15 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
MOHAMMAD TARIQ KHALIL | Trustee | 15 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
SUFIAN SADIQ | Trustee | 15 August 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.74k | £90.46k | £33.25k | £87.23k | £69.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.32k | £76.43k | £71.56k | £83.83k | £67.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.54k | £27.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/08/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM FOR GENERAL PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BROADCASTING ISLAMIC MESSAGES OF A TEACHING NATURE THROUGH LIBRARY FACILITIES, LECTURES AND DISTRIBUTION OF LITERATURE ABOUT ISLAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37C Upper George Street
LUTON
LU1 2RG
- Phone:
- 01582 452356
- Email:
- contact@discover-islam.co.uk
- Website:
-
discover-islam.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window