FIRST STEP PRE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
First Step Pre-school Ltd is based in Thornbury, near Bristol, and we run pre-school sessions for children from age 2 up to 5 years. We are based the site of a local primary school Crossways Infant School. Our staff are well-qualified, dedicated and enthusiastic, and we have a fantastic range of facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £190,040 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 23 June 2011: Standard registration
- 06 December 2011: Funds received from 1022996 FIRST STEP PRESCHOOL
- FIRST STEP PRE SCHOOL LTD (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Tolan | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Antoniades | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Thomas | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Graham | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Goodeve-Docker | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Turner | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Spence | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.28k | £170.52k | £164.67k | £195.02k | £219.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.57k | £136.47k | £171.96k | £188.08k | £217.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £156.68k | £151.66k | £138.05k | £169.47k | £190.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/07/2006 as amended on 13 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
To enhance the development and education of children aged 2 years to 4 years 11 months
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Step Preschool Ltd
Knapp Road
Thornbury
BRISTOL
BS35 2HQ
- Phone:
- 01454867283
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window