Governing document RESEARCH CANCER CURE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/10/2011 as amended on 19 Sep 2021as amended on 19 Sep 2021as amended on 21 Jul 2021 as amended on 12 Sep 2023as amended on 12 Sep 2023as amended on 14 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
a) The relief of sickness and the preservation of good health by initiating, encouraging and supporting research for the public benefit into the causes, prevention, diagnosis and methods of treatment of cancer and allied diseases. b) the relief of those in need, by reason of ill-health due to cancer by provision of funds to cover accommodation expenses and/or medical fees and/or travel expenses for medical appointments.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.