Trustees WIGSTON FRAMEWORK KNITTERS MUSEUM LIMITED
Charity number: 1142492

Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARTH ANTHONY BOULTER | Chair | 20 June 2011 |
|
|||||||
Morris James Timothy Alton | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Lindsey Huscroft | Trustee | 08 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
John Lloyd Marlow | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Neil Philip Hancock | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
TERENCE GEORGE HOWATT | Trustee | 20 April 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT BOWMAN | Trustee | 20 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.