VICTORIA ISLAMIC CULTURAL & EDUCATION CENTRE (VICEC)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the charity as set out in the Governance document is to advance the Islamic Faith for the public benefit. Our aims are to provide facilities for the Muslim population of Victoria to worship their Creator and to educate them about their faith. We also wish to develop the self-confidence of the Muslim community in their faith through our events and activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 26 September 2011: Standard registration
- 19 April 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/03/2018 | 15/03/2019 | 15/03/2020 | 15/03/2021 | 15/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.40k | £37.82k | £2.24k | £8.10k | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.85k | £42.91k | £1.20k | £375 | £285 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 04/09/2011
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; (B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR WITHIN WESTMINSTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WESTMINSTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 4. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE INHABITANTS OF WESTMINSTER AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window