THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE BLESSED VIRGIN, ADDINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC of St Mary's supports the incumbent of this Church of England Parish to support the mission of the Church and to enable as many people as possible to worship at the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 21 June 2011: Standard registration
- 01 November 2018: Funds received from 287701 ADDINGTON ST MARY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
- ST MARY'S ADDINGTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynn Clark | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Clark | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Davies | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marc Opaleye | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oscar Quigley | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hook | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Robinson | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Henocq | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Deborah Forman | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Pannell | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
TERESA LOCK | Trustee | 25 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Terry Player | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV Barbara Gentilella BA | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP THOMAS DAVISON | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA MARGARET PARKER | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA DOROTHY HEADY | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER RAYMOND WILSON | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
GORDON FRANK SADLER | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Parker | Trustee | 01 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Ould | Trustee | 01 May 2000 |
|
|
||||
Karen Holloway | Trustee | 01 May 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.56k | £102.60k | £166.43k | £129.11k | £136.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.30k | £104.80k | £125.10k | £145.73k | £137.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2022 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2022 | 362 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office St.Marys Church Hall
Addington Village Road
CROYDON
CR0 5AS
- Phone:
- 02086513818
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window