LANGTOFT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities to support arts and cultural and sport and recreational activities for the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 25 January 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUNE FISHER | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE CAROLINE TATAM | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARC SKINNER | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA SIMPSON | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Jarman | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Archer | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|||||
VYLMA DENNISTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
YVONNE MCCULLOCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.09k | £18.83k | £14.66k | £8.84k | £18.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.14k | £6.31k | £10.61k | £19.26k | £20.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.67k | £3.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 21ST JUNE 1972.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WHITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LANGTOFT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Langtoft Village Hall
26 West End
Langtoft
Peterborough
PE6 9LS
- Phone:
- 01778341845
- Email:
- sarcher321@sky.com
- Website:
-
langtoftvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window