Financial history FELIX FUND - THE BOMB DISPOSAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1142494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £377.51k £146.18k £430.26k £145.69k £197.19k
Total expenditure £229.39k £135.40k £250.14k £259.04k £387.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A