Trustees ARDEN (SOLIHULL) UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1142408

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Strong | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Kench | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Allister | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Couch | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Coull | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gail Bagnall | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
June Bishop | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Stevens | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Fernie | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.