FAIRFIELD COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and enhance the development of preschool children in the local community by supporting parents to access quality care and education for their children in that community regardless of race, culture, religion, ability or means; encouraging and enabling parents to be involved in their children?s preschool education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 14 July 2011: Standard registration
- 01 May 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.12k | £303 | £10 | £4 | £6 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.47k | £300 | £2.57k | £1.99k | £3.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 10 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 24 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 18 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 20 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/05/2011
Charitable objects
FAIRFIELD COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL SUPPORT GROUP WILL ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY BY SUPPORTING PARENTS TO ACCESS QUALITY CARE AND EDUCATION FOR THEIR CHILDREN IN THAT COMMUNITY REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, ABILITY OR MEANS; ENCOURAGING AND ENABLING PARENTS TO BE INVOLVED IN THEIR CHILDREN PRE-SCHOOL EDUCATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window