GREEN TEMPLETON COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A college in the University of Oxford the objects of Green Templeton College shall be to further study, learning, education and research within the University of Oxford and to be a College wherein men and women may carry out advanced study or research particularly in management studies, medical and life sciences, social sciences and a range of other subject areas as approved by its Governing Body.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£7,558,000
Donations and legacies | £583.00k | |
Charitable activities | £4.43m | |
Other trading activities | £199.00k | |
Investments | £2.21m | |
Other | £136.00k |
Total expenditure:
£7,618,000
Raising funds | £413.00k | |
Charitable activities | £7.09m | |
Other | £113.00k |
-£4,649,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £526.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.09m |
People

101 Employee(s)
37 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 07 June 2011: Standard registration
- GTC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Trudie Lang | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Catherine Pope | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sir Jonathan Montgomery | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Sharott | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sara Shaw | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cook | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Profess Belinda Lennox | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Giuseppe De Giacomo | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Butler | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simon de Lusignan | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alan Silman | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sonia Antoranz Contera | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Greenhalgh | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stavros Petrou | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Radhika Chadha | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sheila Lumley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Susan Ziebland | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Dixon | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Professor Jack Satsangi | Trustee | 09 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Stenton | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR TIM CLAYDEN | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|||||
John Webster | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Professor Gary Ford | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PAUL KLENERMAN | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sarah Darby FRS | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Professor Mary Daly | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr FELIX REED-TSOCHAS | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROF SUE DOPSON | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|||||
Dr LAURENCE LEAVER | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARC THOMPSON | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor ELISABETH HSU | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr REBECCA SURENDER | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD CUTHBERTSON | Trustee | 27 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROF MARK HARRISON | Trustee | 27 May 2011 |
|
|||||
PROF PETER FRIEND | Trustee | 27 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Reynolds | Trustee | 27 May 2011 |
|
|||||
Professor STEPHEN TUCKER | Trustee | 27 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61m | £6.21m | £6.62m | £6.35m | £7.56m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.16m | £6.79m | £7.38m | £8.96m | £7.62m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £791.00k | £763.00k | £1.40m | £572.00k | £583.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £285.00k | £98.00k | £110.00k | £199.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.18m | £3.20m | £3.31m | £3.99m | £4.43m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.44m | £1.71m | £1.67m | £1.68m | £2.21m | |
|
Income - Other | £206.00k | £252.00k | £139.00k | £3.00k | £136.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.99m | £6.59m | £7.19m | £8.74m | £7.09m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £132.00k | £203.00k | £150.00k | £181.00k | £413.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.00k | £25.00k | £2.47m | £0 | £47.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £1.00k | £1.00k | £0 | £87.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £41.00k | £0 | £40.00k | £32.00k | £113.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £66.01m | £64.95m | £63.78m | £62.86m | £61.99m | |
|
Long-term investments | £33.90m | £40.93m | £41.69m | £42.04m | £37.92m | |
|
Other assets | £2.53m | £3.93m | £2.36m | £3.13m | £2.63m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.38m | -£1.06m | -£932.00k | -£1.95m | -£1.18m | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.37m | £5.95m | £1.32m | £1.84m | £1.83m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 01/10/2008 AND STATUTES EFFECTIVE FROM 1 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COLLEGE SHALL BE TO FURTHER STUDY, LEARNING, EDUCATION AND RESEARCH WITHIN THE UNIVERSITY AND TO BE A COLLEGE WHEREIN MEN AND WOMEN MAY CARRY OUT ADVANCED STUDY OR RESEARCH PARTICULARLY IN MANAGEMENT STUDIES, MEDICAL AND LIFE SCIENCES, SOCIAL SCIENCES AND A RANGE OF OTHER SUBJECT AREAS AS APPROVED BY ITS GOVERNING BODY.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREEN TEMPLETON COLLEGE
43 WOODSTOCK ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 6HG
- Phone:
- 01865274773
- Email:
- pa@gtc.ox.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window