LIFTON COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1146871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising funds to add solar panels to Lifton Community Centre and to add a third meeting room. Also hiring the hall out to clubs, organisations and parties for a variety of activities to serve the village of Lifton and the surrounding area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £25,986
Total expenditure: £36,972

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 April 2012: Standard registration
  • 17 October 2012: Funds received from 1050975 LIFTON SOCIAL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Maxine Alexander Trustee 17 June 2024
None on record
WILLIAM BURNS GLEN Trustee 13 November 2023
LAUNCESTON REFUGEE SUPPORT GROUP
Received: 7 days late
Michelle Grenney Trustee 21 November 2018
None on record
Philip Francis Cleary Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
TERENCE LEWIS Trustee 27 November 2012
PROJECT EQUINOX
Received: On time
PENINSULA MEDICAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROGER BRUCE CHEVES Trustee 15 July 2011
None on record
LAVINIA GAY MARSHALL Trustee 15 July 2011
None on record
JOHN NELSON DYKE Trustee 15 July 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £32.36k £15.47k £24.62k £27.18k £25.99k
Total expenditure £28.99k £29.20k £10.86k £27.13k £36.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £11.00k £10.67k £10.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 25 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 25 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 21 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 21 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 08 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Hornapark Close
LIFTON
Devon
PL16 0BE
Phone:
01566784513