EBENEZER FELLOWSHIP AFMIM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preaching the gospel religious devotional work Offering free meals and teas to the public Sports, games and raising awareness to the youth The activities take place at St Pauls Catholic school Pheonix Drive Leadenhall, Milton Keynes MK6 5EN Christ Church, Stantonbury Campus Saxon Gate MK14 6BN. And Heelands Meeting Place Milton Keynes Council Hall Heelands
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 24 June 2011: Standard registration
- 09 October 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 October 2014: Re-registered
- APOSTOLIC FAITH MISSION INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES UK EBENEZER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Manondo Alywin Machipisa | Chair | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Mugadza | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wellington Gubwe | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.34k | £45.90k | £33.70k | £60.62k | £65.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.18k | £32.64k | £50.89k | £65.68k | £70.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES AS CONTAINED IN THE CONFESSIONS OF FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Fadmoor Place
Emerson Valley
MILTON KEYNES
MK4 2EU
- Phone:
- 07714821427
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window