THE CROSBY ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Crosby Orchestral Society performs as the Crosby Symphony Orchestra in the Sefton, Liverpool and neighbouring areas. The Society aims to foster the general public's appreciation of orchestral and chamber music by presenting a varied repertoire in public concerts each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 10 June 2011: Standard registration
- CROSBY SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin John Cartlidge MA DPhil | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Frederick Rimmer | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth James Harrison MD FRCS | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Salters | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Charlotte Belfield MBChB MRCP | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neill Sutherland Carroll | Trustee | 26 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
GLENN PHILIP WAITE | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Helen Ghorbal | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA HELEN MUNRO | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
EDMUND PAUL THOMAS | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ROBERT CRESSWELL B.SC HONS | Trustee | 10 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev GREGOR JOHN CUFF | Trustee | 24 May 2011 |
|
|||||
KATHLEEN ESTHER KENRICK | Trustee | 24 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.29k | £830 | £26.06k | £23.12k | £41.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.21k | £1.78k | £31.52k | £17.58k | £21.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2024
(These accounts |
07 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ADOPTED 04/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: 1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; 2. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Chestnut Avenue
Crosby
Liverpool
L23 2SZ
- Phone:
- 01519246250
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window