COMMUNITY PLAYCENTRE @ WALBERTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community Playcentre is set up for the advancement of education and citizenship or community benefit. Objectives are to benefit children and young people in the parish of Walberton and Binsted and surrounding areas. Having built a sustainable building, the charity's role is to manage, maintain and improve the facilities the building will offer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £417 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 September 2011: Standard registration
- CP@W (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Purdie | Chair | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Meissel | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toby Hewson | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jemma Hutchison | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Rogers | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Rogers | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £359.65k | £379.02k | £413.33k | £401.89k | £476.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.83k | £369.61k | £362.28k | £427.42k | £467.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.96k | £6.13k | £1.85k | £417 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/05/2011
Charitable objects
OBJECTS: TO BENEFIT THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE PARISH OF WALBERTON AND BINSTED AND SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE SAID CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Playcentre at Walberton
The Street
Walberton
ARUNDEL
BN18 0PJ
- Phone:
- 01243 931848
- Email:
- info@communityplaycentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window